Accounts and annual returns DESIGN & BUILD (PLAY)

Charity number: 1118136
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 20 February 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 20 February 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2011 15 September 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2010 11 February 2011 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 06 January 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 26 March 2010 54 days late