Financial history THE MANSOOJAT FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1115379
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £46.92k £0 £2.83k £2.21k £10.34k
Total expenditure £11.86k £8.49k £12.90k £12.61k £9.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A