Accounts and annual returns TRES DIAS SOUTH WEST OF ENGLAND

Charity number: 1115218
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2013 20 April 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2012 23 May 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2011 20 August 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2010 18 July 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2010 Not Required