Financial history RIVERCOURT INTERNATIONAL CHURCH (RIC).

Charity number: 1117622
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £43.91k £80.49k £59.19k £68.97k £68.50k
Total expenditure £42.06k £65.96k £64.35k £94.77k £90.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A