Accounts and annual returns HARROW HEALTHY LIVING CENTRE LTD

Charity number: 1123254
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2011 27 January 2012 30 days late
Annual return 28 February 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2010 23 November 2010 On Time
Annual return 28 February 2009 15 December 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2009 15 December 2009 On Time