Accounts and annual returns THE SHASHE-LIMPOPO PREDATOR RESEARCH GROUP

Charity number: 1115723
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2013 26 April 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2012 26 April 2013 85 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2011 06 December 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2010 09 June 2011 129 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not Required