Accounts and annual returns ENLIGHTENMENT: THE VOICE OF SPIRIT

Charity Number: 1115900
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 17 January 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 09 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 05 November 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2015 07 January 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2015 Not Required