Financial history BEDFORDSHIRE AND LUTON LEARNING ENRICHMENT TRUST

Charity Number: 1115830
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014
Total gross income £24 £24 £8.03k £6.79k £47.88k
Total expenditure £2.48k £5.38k £46.46k £9.88k £45.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A