Accounts and annual returns J P S HOUSING

Charity number: 1116337
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 25 November 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 25 November 2016 22 December 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2015 24 May 2016 114 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 21 October 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2014 23 June 2015 143 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 28 April 2015 87 days late