Financial history CHALONER CHILDRENS CHARITY

Charity number: 1115902
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £18.01k £184.80k £72.11k £85.46k £46.11k
Total expenditure £265.07k £6.60k £62.84k £162.97k £164.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A