Accounts and annual returns SPECIAL TOYS EDUCATIONAL POSTAL SERVICE

Charity number: 1115505
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2011 01 October 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 23 July 2012 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2010 31 August 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 31 August 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2009 30 October 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 29 July 2010 On Time