Financial history THE BANGLADESH CULTURAL ASSOCIATION (WOKING)

Charity number: 1118652
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £83.13k £39.24k £55.56k £56.10k £85.97k
Total expenditure £35.34k £22.22k £29.52k £32.22k £65.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A