Accounts and annual returns PAUL DAVIES FOUNDATION LTD

Charity number: 1117091
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 13 January 2011 74 days late