Financial history WIMBLEDON FILM CLUB

Charity number: 1117750
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £15.02k £4.67k £9.05k £13.88k £12.70k
Total expenditure £11.67k £5.83k £11.48k £13.68k £12.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A