Financial history DIVINE TOUCH: CHURCH OF GOD MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1124246
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/10/2019 28/10/2020 28/10/2021 28/10/2022 28/10/2023
Total gross income £587 £16 £30 £1.45k £386
Total expenditure £654 £14 £22 £1.47k £385
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A