Accounts and annual returns NATIONAL CRIMINAL JUSTICE DRUG WORKERS FORUM

Charity number: 1118243
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2010 10 March 2011 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 10 February 2011 10 days late
Annual return 31 March 2009 23 October 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 23 October 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 24 September 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 02 October 2008 On Time