Accounts and annual returns MARTIN WOODWARD CANCER TRUST

Charity number: 1115986
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 19 December 2017 26 August 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 19 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 19 December 2016 16 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 19 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 19 December 2015 30 April 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 19 December 2015 Not Required
Annual return 19 December 2014 02 May 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 19 December 2014 Not Required