Accounts and annual returns EUROJEWS

Charity number: 1119356
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2012 01 November 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2011 09 October 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2010 17 August 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2009 26 July 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not Required