Accounts and annual returns TARSCO ALUMNI ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1117459
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2012 14 December 2012 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2011 14 September 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2010 08 October 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2009 08 December 2009 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2009 Not Required