Financial history HEPATITIS B FOUNDATION UK

Charity Number: 1116556
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2011 30/06/2012 30/06/2013 30/06/2014 30/06/2015
Total gross income £5.56k £13.67k £318 £5.00k £0
Total expenditure £13.03k £12.24k £11.37k £2.19k £942
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A