Accounts and annual returns DIVERSITYINCARE LTD

Charity number: 1117068
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 12 April 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 12 April 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 12 April 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 12 April 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 13 April 2017 16 February 2018 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 13 April 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

16 February 2018 3 days late
Annual return 12 April 2016 05 June 2017 113 days late
Accounts and TAR 12 April 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

05 June 2017 113 days late