Accounts and annual returns HOPE MEDICAL AND EDUCATIONAL AID

Charity number: 1119283
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 22 February 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 22 February 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 22 February 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 22 February 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 22 February 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 22 February 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 22 February 2014 19 February 2015 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 22 February 2014 Not Required