Trustees HURWORTH GRANGE SENIOR CITIZENS CLUB

Charity number: 1116916
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ELIZABETH ANNE DUCKWORTH Chair 07 November 2012
None on record
Maurice Cook Trustee 08 May 2019
None on record
Joan Wishart Trustee 08 May 2019
None on record
Mabel Walton Trustee 06 December 2017
None on record
john wishart Trustee 01 June 2017
None on record
robert andrew wrightson Trustee 01 October 2014
None on record