Accounts and annual returns MOTHER HELPAGE (UK)

Charity Number: 1119287
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 28 February 2011 18 August 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2011 18 August 2011 On Time
Annual return 28 February 2010 05 July 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2010 05 July 2010 On Time
Annual return 28 February 2009 23 June 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2009 Not Required