Accounts and annual returns ROOTED IN CHRIST MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1118088
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2024 08 February 2025 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2023 30 May 2024 119 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2022 15 March 2023 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2021 04 April 2022 62 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2020 01 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 Not Required