Accounts and annual returns BRADFORD FAMILYS SUPPORT NETWORK

Charity number: 1118065
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2021 25 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2020 14 October 2021 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2019 18 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2018 11 September 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 Not Required