Financial history GREENHILLS PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1131512
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £86.22k £73.53k £90.03k £104.83k £137.12k
Total expenditure £83.12k £80.59k £80.73k £109.82k £111.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £73.67k £57.29k £70.89k £75.13k £98.45k