Financial history WORLDWIDE HELPERS

Charity Number: 1117253
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018
Total gross income £7.00k £5.50k £18.65k £17.60k £9.45k
Total expenditure £5.40k £11.39k £17.50k £19.58k £8.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A