Financial history THE RUNNING WATER TRUST

Charity Number: 1117239
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 20/09/2019 20/09/2021 20/09/2022 20/09/2023 20/09/2024
Total gross income £5.21k £470 £6.00k £9.70k £9.00k
Total expenditure £5.21k £320 £7.20k £10.00k £9.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A