Accounts and annual returns THE MAD HATTERS' CLUB

Charity number: 1119028
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2010 20 July 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2009 29 October 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2008 23 November 2009 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2007 12 November 2008 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required