Financial history HOOK VILLAGE HALLS CHARITABLE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1117754
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £210.45k £145.43k £228.52k £235.08k £275.86k
Total expenditure £204.05k £139.53k £170.84k £183.31k £204.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £83.74k £23.00k £1.00k £1.10k