Financial history NANCY REUBEN PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1117515
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £1.73m £1.40m £1.99m £1.49m £1.83m
Total expenditure £1.53m £1.56m £1.67m £1.76m £1.93m
Income from government contracts £114.18k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £222.07k £175.89k £215.50k £238.02k
Income - Donations and legacies £498.05k £314.03k £775.97k £324.74k £582.50k
Income - Other trading activities £175.22k £0 £197.64k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.05m £937.81k £1.02m £1.13m £1.18m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £278 £564 £42 £161 £4.60k
Income - Other £0 £145.83k £0 £41.18k £64.96k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.49m £1.55m £1.65m £1.74m £1.90m
Expenditure - Raising funds £40.97k £7.34k £13.31k £18.12k £29.44k
Expenditure - Governance £11.27k £11.23k £17.56k £18.48k £18.86k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0