Governing document HALESOWEN CHURCH OF ENGLAND VOLUNTARY AIDED SCHOOL
Charity number: 1120838
Charity reporting is overdue by 1802 days
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED DATED 6 NOVEMBER 1838. AS AMENDED 5 SEPTEMBER 1845, 4 MARCH 1859, 14 JUNE 1859 AND 9 OCTOBER 1885
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSE OF ERECTING THEREON A SCHOOL ROOM OR SCHOOL ROOMS TO BE USED FOR THE EDUCATION OF POOR CHILDREN IN THE PRINCIPLES OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION ACCORDING TO THE DOCTRINES AND DISCIPLINE OF THE UNITED CHURCH OF ENGLAND AND IRELAND
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, WEST MIDLANDS
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.