Accounts and annual returns NIMH PRESTON CLINIC

Charity number: 1119040
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2009 14 June 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2009 27 May 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2008 27 January 2010 211 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2008 16 July 2009 16 days late