Financial history MYTHOLM MEADOWS SHOP

Charity Number: 1118302
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2009 31/08/2010 31/08/2011 31/08/2012 31/08/2013
Total gross income £13.91k £10.83k £7.60k £7.39k £6.24k
Total expenditure £12.90k £9.08k £6.79k £6.67k £6.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A