Financial history GAMBIANS IN NEED

Charity number: 1117831
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.16k £2.92k £2.50k £2.76k £3.44k
Total expenditure £1.21k £1.06k £2.50k £2.50k £3.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A