Accounts and annual returns BRITISH FRIENDS OF TORAS SIMCHA

Charity number: 1118383
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2013 16 April 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2011 30 September 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2010 11 March 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2009 11 March 2011 131 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not Required