Accounts and annual returns FLINTHAM SPORTS AND SOCIAL ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1118888
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 12 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 24 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 November 2021 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required