Financial history CARE COMPUTERS FOR DEVELOPING COUNTRIES LIMITED

Charity number: 1119537
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2011 31/01/2012 31/01/2013 31/01/2014 31/01/2015
Total gross income £27.99k £10.02k £7.65k £500 £1.00k
Total expenditure £29.12k £10.52k £4.81k £1.00k £107
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A