Trustees DUKERIES THIRD AGE GROUP (U3A)
Charity number: 1118205
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Barbara Elizabeth Baglee | Chair | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Ann Arnold | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Martyn Webb | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Roger Bartlett | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Michael Mounsey | Trustee | 20 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maria Pitrolino | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Lesley Young | Trustee | 25 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip Christopher Neighbour | Trustee | 08 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Gordon Harris | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Leslye Henstock | Trustee | 15 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ann Street | Trustee | 20 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Ann Neighbour | Trustee | 20 May 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.