Financial history DILSTON PHYSIC GARDEN LTD

Charity number: 1120141
Charity reporting is up to date (108 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023
Total gross income £28.05k £59.99k £71.83k £80.53k £76.67k
Total expenditure £30.94k £40.42k £71.16k £70.99k £89.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A