Accounts and annual returns RENDEZVOUS A CLUB FOR DISABLED PEOPLE WITH WALKING DIFFICULITIES

Charity number: 1119539
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 January 2015 15 June 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2015 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2014 22 April 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2014 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2013 30 June 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2013 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2012 11 October 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2012 Not Required