Charity overview ST JOHNS DIOCESAN HOME

Charity number: 1113237-1
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEME DATED 12 JULY 1994 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 14 FEBRUARY 2007 (AS AFFECTED BY UNITING DIRECTION MADE UNDER S.96 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 DATED 14 FEBRUARY 2007) FURTHER AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 18 FEBRUARY 2009.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF AND SUPPORT OF PARENTS AND THEIR CHILDREN WHO THROUGH SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES HAVE BEEN DEPRIVED OF A NORMAL LIFE OR WHO ARE IN DANGER OR ARE VICTIMS OR AT RISK FROM ABUSE.
Area of benefit
BRISTOL
Registration history
  • 27 February 2007: Standard registration
  • 23 March 2010: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Other names

No other names

This charity is a linked charity of