Financial history SCHOLAR GREEN PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1118443
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.94k £308 £1.49k £5.22k £2.62k
Total expenditure £2.11k £1.33k £3.07k £5.63k £1.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A