Financial history PRISONERS ON DEATH ROW

Charity number: 1119587
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2007 31/12/2008 31/12/2009 31/12/2010 31/12/2011
Total gross income £32.65k £20.20k £68 £52 £50
Total expenditure £29.32k £23.46k £397 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A