Financial history KINSHIP CARERS

Charity Number: 1122907
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £124.52k £155.86k £182.30k £144.15k £145.44k
Total expenditure £112.68k £113.02k £166.17k £156.13k £152.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £3.00k £40.00k N/A £700