Accounts and annual returns PLACE FOR HOPE

Charity Number: 1119608
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 30 November 2016 06 September 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2015 19 September 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2015 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2014 07 July 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2014 Not Required