Financial history HOMOEOPATHY FOR ALL

Charity Number: 1120370
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2013 31/01/2014 31/01/2015 31/01/2016 31/01/2017
Total gross income £2.92k £0 £0 £246 £0
Total expenditure £2.88k £2.98k £664 £1.66k £64
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0