Financial history ABBIES FUND

Charity Number: 1119273
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £41.09k £4.82k £25.07k £20.86k £6.03k
Total expenditure £41.24k £0 £40.29k £3.47k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A