Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF THE CHILDRENS HOUSE AND MONTESSORI SCHOOL

Charity number: 1120752
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 19 February 2018 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 28 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2015 16 January 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2014 25 January 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required